# Math: Multiplying Numbers

Only available on StudyMode
• Published : November 18, 2012

Text Preview
Lesson1
Lesson1
These lessons are based on Vedic Maths" principles and other maths tricks.These principles are general in nature and can be applied in many ways and very very useful in commercial arthematics. I hope all of you like these lessons and make your calculation more fast and save lot of time in daily calculations and examinations or any entrance test like CAT /IIT /BANK PO /ENGINEERING ENTRANCE TEST/PMT /MCA ENTRANCE TEST/MBA ENTRANCE TEST etc etc

Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are same and the last figures add to1 0 . 42 x 48 =
figures (2 and 8) add up to 10.
just multiply 4 by 5 (the next number up)
to get 20 for the first part of the answer.
And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to
get the last part of the answer
Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures add up 10 and the last figures are same 44X64
Here first figures are 4 and 6 and their add up 10 and unit figures of both number are same Just multiplying the last figures 4x4=16 Put it at right hand side
Again multiplying the first figures and add common degit(4x6 )+4=24+4=28 put it at left hand side Now we get required answer2816
Similarly 36x76 , 6X6 =36 right hand side , (3x7)+6= 21+6=27 left hand side Required answer is 2736
NOTE If multiplication of last figures is less than 10 add zero before unit digit Ex 81x21 , 1x1=01,( 8x2)+1= 16+1=17 Required answer 1701
Method for multiplying numbers where the first number"s add up10 and and the second number's digits are same 46X55
Here first number's add up is 10 and second number "s digits are common i.e 5 Just multiplying last figures of both numbers 6x5 =30 put it at right hand side Again multiplying first figures of both numbers and add common digit of second number (4x5)+5 =20+5 =25 put it left hand side

Required answer is 2530 ( If multiplication is in unit in first step add zero before it)...